Shooting Star Children's Hospices

Charity number: 1042495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity provides care services to life-limited children and their families at home, in the community and at their two hospices, Christopher's in Guildford and Shooting Star House in Hampton. These services included respite care, symptom management and end of life care. A wide range of therapy and bereavement counselling services are also provided for children and family members.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1994: Standard registration
  • 25 March 2021: Funds received from 1127948 HEAVENLY STARS
  • 02 December 2021: Funds received from 1030935 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF FELTHAM BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
  • 12 September 2024: Funds received from 258748 THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE WALTON-ON-THAMES HOSP...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CHASE (Working name)
  • SHOOTING STAR CHASE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillip Ludlow Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Carole Pharoah Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Olga Nuryaeva Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Dr Kheelna Bavalia Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Dr Sally Joanne Johnson Trustee 03 April 2023
SARCOMA UK
Received: On time
Professor Alison Mary Robertson Trustee 03 April 2023
None on record
Christopher Lewin Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Swati Suri Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Katherine Nicola Theobald Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Andrew John Edge Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Andrew Maxwell Coppel CBE Trustee 14 June 2019
None on record
SIMON DENNIS JOHN BARKER Trustee 05 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.09m £10.01m £9.61m £10.63m £12.35m
Total expenditure £10.73m £8.78m £7.68m £9.80m £10.60m
Income from government contracts N/A £276.00k £510.00k £628.00k £646.00k
Income from government grants £929.49k £2.16m £1.01m £1.50m £1.79m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.54m £3.98m £3.95m £3.49m £4.38m
Income - Other trading activities £3.75m £2.37m £2.94m £3.46m £3.68m
Income - Charitable activities £1.64m £2.87m £2.61m £3.02m £3.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £100.00k £66.66k £0
Income - Investment £118.94k £90.67k £89.69k £139.99k £425.44k
Income - Other £48.72k £700.62k £23.99k £521.79k £610.37k
Income - Legacies £2.15m £629.41k £1.15m £742.17k £1.48m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.19m £6.05m £5.31m £6.52m £7.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.54m £2.73m £2.37m £3.27m £3.21m
Expenditure - Governance £15.67k £16.77k £15.65k £25.84k £26.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.70k £16.77k £20.88k £17.48k £30.03k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £5.44m £4.88m £4.59m £4.27m £3.94m
Long-term investments £3.05m £3.86m £4.00m £5.73m £7.31m
Other assets £4.09m £5.89m £7.95m £7.28m £8.44m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.11m £1.11m £923.04k £1.08m £1.33m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Shooting Star Childrens Hospice
Shooting Star House
The Avenue
HAMPTON
Middlesex
TW12 3RA
Phone:
02087832000