THE ASIAN HEALTH AGENCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Asian Health Agency aims to: 1. serve the different but equal needs within Asian communities 2. address the inequality and injustice within mainstream services and service providers 3. maintain an anti-racist and anti-discriminatory position 4. uphold the principle of SEVA (serving the communities)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£590,185
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £590.18k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£644,605
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £636.14k | |
Other | £8.46k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £575,204 from 5 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.46k | |
Charitable expenditure | £636.14k |
People

34 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Slough
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 30 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAMALJIT KAUR JOHAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
VIRINDAR BASSI | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
AYMERO GEBMESKREL | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MUKESH SOLANKI | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DHARMA RAMDASS APPADOO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAMINI SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEUAN LLEWELYN GERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £517.26k | £693.31k | £745.08k | £647.40k | £590.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £521.27k | £612.89k | £731.03k | £730.04k | £644.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £360.00k | £507.03k | £631.19k | £586.18k | £575.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.83k | N/A | £85.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £17.70k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £29.33k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £470.23k | £693.31k | £745.08k | £647.40k | £590.18k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £518.55k | £610.92k | £729.05k | £720.32k | £636.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.71k | £1.96k | £1.98k | £9.72k | £8.46k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.38k | £5.41k | £33.53k | £23.47k | £15.01k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £102.79k | £222.79k | £209.35k | £138.27k | £96.26k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £16.04k | £53.65k | £54.27k | £55.77k | £59.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED ON 3RD JULY 1997 AND 30TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
(A)THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY AND INFIRM PERSONS, PERSONS WITH A MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR PERSONS WITH A MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEM, PRIMARILY FROM ASIAN COMMUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF DAY CARE AND OTHER APPROPRIATE SERVICES. (B)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION TO SUCH PERSONS OR TO PERSONS CARING FOR OR NURSING SUCH PERSONS. (C)THE PROVISION OF LUNCHEON CLUBS AND SIMILAR SERVICES FOR ELDERLY AND INFIRM PERSONS PRIMARILY FROM ASIAN COMMUNITIES. (D)TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH, TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES IN THE FIELD OF CARE AND HEALTH EDUCATION. (E)TO SUPPORT COMMUNITY BASED INITIATIVES AND PROJECTS ON HEALTH CARE AND HEALTH EDUCATION WITH PEOPLE PRIMARILY FROM ASIAN COMMUNITIES. (F)TO PROMOTE HEALTHY LIFESTYLES AMONG DIFFERENT SECTIONS OF THE ASIAN COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE SOCIAL, RELIGIOUS, CULTURAL AND LINGUISTIC CONTEXTS OF THE ASIAN COMMUNITIES. (G)TO PUBLISH REPORTS AND MATERIALS TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH CARE AND HEALTH EDUCATION RELATED ISSUES AND NEEDS AFFECTING PEOPLE PRIMARILY FROM ASIAN COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAHA c/o Dominion Centre & Library
112 The Green
SOUTHALL
Middlesex
UB2 4BQ
- Phone:
- 02085717928
- Email:
- director@taha.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window