PSJ PRIMARY PARENT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide grants for educational and extra curriculum activities within the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 02 December 1994: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF PEASEDOWN SCHOOL (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF PEASEDOWN ST JOHN PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Dalton | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Joan Marchant | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Chun | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Rosie Beth Williams | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mary Burnell | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Leslie Morley | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.54k | £7.24k | £10.25k | £12.84k | £14.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.07k | £8.88k | £5.61k | £7.10k | £16.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEASEDOWN ST. JOHN PRIMARY SCHOOL
BATH ROAD
PEASEDOWN ST. JOHN
BATH
BA2 8DH
- Phone:
- 01761432311
- Email:
- katielouisechun@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window