Financial history ALLSORTS PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1042520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £559.55k £582.89k £481.72k £675.10k £536.23k
Total expenditure £591.36k £544.43k £560.05k £534.37k £569.22k
Income from government contracts N/A £480.26k £337.12k £475.66k £320.79k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £157.80k £102.49k N/A £196.45k £0
Income - Other trading activities £2.75k £0 N/A £2.80k £534.93k
Income - Charitable activities £398.98k £480.26k N/A £475.66k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £31 £18 N/A £198 £7
Income - Other £0 £122 N/A £0 £1.29k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £78.21k £544.43k N/A £80.19k £569.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £513.15k £0 N/A £454.18k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0