Financial history THE GAINSBOROUGH MODEL RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1042534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.84k £7.07k £2.30k £5.88k £7.19k
Total expenditure £3.51k £6.26k £597 £5.05k £4.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A