Governing document ISLAMIC PRESENTATION CENTRE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 1990 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 10 FEBRUARY 1994, 5 AUGUST 1994, 18 NOVEMBER 1994 AND 11 JULY 2006; CERTIFICATES OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 JUNE 1990, 15 JUNE 1994 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO CREATE A FUND TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE AND RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY) OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH; TO PROMOTE THE ISLAMIC FAITH AMONGST MUSLIMS AND NON MUSLIMS THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF THE COMPANY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.