Governing document THE FRIENDS OF HOLY CROSS PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF HOLY CROSS PREPARATORY SCHOOL KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND OTHER PROVINCES OF THE HOLY CROSS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BY: PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND AMENITIES AND ORGANISING ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL; AND MAKING EDUCATIONAL GRANTS AND AWARDS TO ANY PROVINCE OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE SISTERS OF THE HOLY CROSS MENZINGEN
Area of benefit
HOLY CROSS PREPARATORY SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.