BRITISH LYMPHOLOGY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education/knowledge in the field of lymphology/related subjects; to foster interest in/co-ordinate a strategy for improving the management of chronic oedema, particularly lymphoedema.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 December 1994: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- B L S (Working name)
- BRITISH LYMPHOLOGY INTEREST GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.32k | £192.21k | £211.52k | £171.53k | £180.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.53k | £158.14k | £148.05k | £190.97k | £210.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 18 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 18 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 21 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
21 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 02 March 2017 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
02 March 2017 | 30 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2014 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE IN THE FIELD OF LYMPHOLOGY AND RELATED SUBJECTS 2. TO FOSTER INTEREST IN AND CO-ORDINATE A STRATEGY FOR IMPROVING THE MANAGEMENT OF CHRONIC OEDEMA, PARTICULARLY LYMPHOEDEMA 3. TO PRODUCE AND MAINTAIN A REGISTER OF SPECIALIST CENTRES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND 4. TO BENEFIT PATIENTS BY IMPROVING THE KNOWLEDGE, EXPERTISE AND SKILLS OF HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS TREATING THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window