BRECKLAND CROSSROADS CARING FOR CARERS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 December 1994: Standard registration
- 06 April 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 April 2005: Funds transferred to 1103959 CROSSROADS CARE EAST ANGLIA LIMITED
- BRECKLAND CROSSROADS (Working name)
- BRECKLAND CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED ATTENDANTS (2) TO PROVIDE HOME CARE ATTENDANCES FOR DISABLED PERSONS LIVING ALONE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE BRECKLAND DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA OF NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window