ST MINVER CP SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1042647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PTA - St Minver School . Fund raising for the benefit of children attending the school and local community through the holding of community based events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £4,632
Total expenditure: £25,600

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MINVER PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Elizabeth Bray Chair 13 October 2016
None on record
Jack Richards Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Nicola Jayn Reader Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Leanne Clare Hall Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.50k £21.95k £21.60k £7.19k £4.63k
Total expenditure £2.74k £15.29k £14.74k £6.62k £25.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.90k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 01 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Pityme Farm Road
St. Minver
WADEBRIDGE
Cornwall
PL27 6PL
Phone:
01208869403