Friends of Gamlingay Village Primary

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising via quizzes, summer fayres, cake sales, fireworks and other village related activities. Main aim is to raise funds to provide additional resources and activities for the children of Gamlingay Village Primary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 08 December 1994: Standard registration
- 24 June 2022: Funds received from 1031944 SUNSHINE PRE-SCHOOL
- GAMLINGAY FSA (Working name)
- GAMLINGAY FIRST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Ross | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Mead | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.67k | £7.55k | £25.05k | £12.10k | £12.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.59k | £4.56k | £13.55k | £6.56k | £6.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2024 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 03 APR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 AUG 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, GAMLINGAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gamlingay Village Primary
Station Road
Gamlingay
Sandy
Bedfordshire
SG19 3HD
- Phone:
- 01767650208
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window