ORPINGTON CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a free counselling service within the framework of Christian beliefs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 20 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Ko | Chair | 20 April 2016 |
|
|||||
John Leonard Doughty | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ko | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.57k | £3.30k | £2.18k | £1.65k | £2.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £3.35k | £2.74k | £1.97k | £2.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1986. DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1994.
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF SPIRITUAL EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORTIVE HELP TO THOSE IN NEED THEREOF AND BY THE TRAINING OF INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH COUNSELLING AND SUPPORTIVE HELP.
Area of benefit
ORPINGTON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BUSHEY AVENUE
PETTS WOOD
ORPINGTON
BR5 1EP
- Phone:
- 07833305665
- Email:
- info@occs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window