Financial history THE SHROPSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity Number: 1042705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £58.43k £89.05k £119.34k £122.72k £143.34k
Total expenditure £57.67k £92.09k £131.75k £130.16k £158.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A