Trustees THE SHROPSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Charity Number: 1042705

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIDGET MARY THURGOOD | Chair | 14 January 2014 |
|
|||||
ANGELA WADEY | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Joanne Wardale | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Williams | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Openshaw | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Forde | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ann Booton | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Oldham | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Bennett | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
June Mary Turner | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.