BE FREE YOUNG CARERS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Be Free Young Carers supports young carers aged 8 to 17 years old, by providing 1 21 emotional support, respite activities, 13 plus Youth Club, bespoke befriending service and offering training in practical skills, all of which helps reduce the anxiety and stress so many young carers experience and increases mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 December 1994: Standard registration
- 10 October 2024: Funds received from 1049373 WANTAGE ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND
- THE SOUTH AND VALE CARERS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Wells | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mellings | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Dunne | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paramjit Parmar | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Eccleston | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Mitchell | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Cooper | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Loretta Light | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angus Kingsley Horner | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.04k | £303.37k | £296.25k | £338.15k | £413.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.72k | £167.81k | £250.94k | £317.38k | £330.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.75k | £53.96k | £21.48k | £6.14k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ALLEVIATE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE CARING OR HAVE CARED FOR ELDERLY, SICK, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR OTHERWISE INFIRM PERSONS AT HOME AND WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO PROMOTE THE MATERIAL WELFARE OF SUCH CARERS AS AFORESAID TO RELIEVE AND ALLEVIATE AND TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OR ALLEVIATION OF ALL KINDS OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, SICKNESS, DISABLEMENT OR HANDICAP INCLUDING MENTAL ILLNESS ATRIBUTABLE TO CARING AMONG CARERS AND THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THEY ARE CARING IN SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE AND THE VALE OF THE WHITE HORSE AND SURROUNDING AREAS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE PART THAT CARERS AND CARING CAN PLAY GENERALLY
Area of benefit
SOUTH OXFORDSHIRE AND THE VALE OF THE WHITE HORSE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harwell Innovation Centre
Curie Avenue
Didcot
Oxfordshire
OX11 0QG
- Phone:
- 01235838554
- Email:
- yc@befreeyc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window