THE MEDIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We inspire the media and communications industry to share their time, knowledge and creativity to benefit charities and underrepresented communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,535,590
Donations and legacies | £458.71k | |
Charitable activities | £1.07m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £9.13k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,582,417
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.58m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.58m |
People

26 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian John Edwards | Chair | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Rousseau-Bedouch | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Philip Anthony Raby Smith | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Naomi Rachel Levy | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Etebom Patrick Davies | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Osei-Nsafoah | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Black | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Exon | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Paul Tomlinson | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satyen Vallabh Dayal | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Owain Thomas | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edmon Paul Couchman | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Ahmed | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93m | £1.62m | £1.85m | £1.27m | £1.54m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67m | £1.35m | £1.70m | £1.79m | £1.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £684.27k | £586.24k | £350.01k | £372.72k | £458.71k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.24m | £1.03m | £1.50m | £772.19k | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £446 | £196 | £14 | £2.35k | £9.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £121.99k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.28m | £1.68m | £1.78m | £1.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £291.65k | £70.46k | £12.26k | £12.36k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.45k | £40.90k | £38.15k | £37.15k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.81k | £3.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.03m | £1.33m | £1.48m | £959.41k | £955.58k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £161.21k | £193.35k | £191.28k | £201.00k | £240.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 25 SEPTEMBER 2001. as amended on 17 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Company is established are: a. to advance the education and training in all forms of media and communications of the public and in particular, members of charitable organisations and non-charitable voluntary organisations, under-represented groups and communities and young people; b. to promote racial and religious harmony and equality and diversity by helping the media and creative sector to advance social responsibility, diversity, inclusion and representation of broader society in their workforce and their output. c. to promote the efficient and effective application of resources for charitable and educational purposes by the provision of advice, training, mentoring, volunteering and creative and related services.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Media Trust c/o Sayer Vincent
110 Golden Lane
LONDON
EC1Y 0TG
- Phone:
- 02078715602
- Email:
- hello@mediatrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window