ORGANISATION OF BLIND AFRICAN CARIBBEANS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of blind/partially sighted Africans and Caribbeans by provision of an information and advice service. To promote and advance primarily the education of the client group by provision of work related training. Reference to blind and partially sighted include persons with other physical and sensory disabilities, including people from other ethnic minority communities in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 1994: Standard registration
- 07 May 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 May 2013: Funds transferred to 1142005 OBAC-(ORGANISATION OF BLIND AFRICANS & CARIBBEANS)
- OBAC (Working name)
- THE ORGANISATION OF BLIND AFRICAN CARIBBEANS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £289.63k | £243.21k | £425.68k | £446.73k | £393.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.76k | £298.46k | £394.20k | £412.10k | £399.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 26 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 26 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 04 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 04 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION, AS AMENDED 19TH NOVEMBER 1994 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(1)TO RELIEVE BLIND/PARTIALLY SIGHTED AFRICAN-CARIBBEANS BY PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION AND ADVICE CENTRE. (11)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF BLIND PARTIALLY/SIGHTED AFRICAN-CARIBBEANS BY PROVISION OF WORK RELATED TRAINING.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window