Financial history FRIENDS OF NORTH BIRMINGHAM ACADEMY

Charity number: 1042762
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £4.32k £2.38k £1.99k £1.50k £1.32k
Total expenditure £3.91k £2.49k £2.25k £1.42k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A