THE BIRMINGHAM BOSNIA HERZEGOVINA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Practical and psychological support to Bosnian community in Birmingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 13 December 1994: Standard registration
- BBHCA (Working name)
- BHAM BOSNIA ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- THE BIRMINGHAM BOSNIA HERCEGOVINA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jusuf Sacic | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Merima Sadic | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lejla Solakovic | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANES CERIC | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.29k | £14.56k | £14.06k | £12.23k | £9.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £6.61k | £7.45k | £11.19k | £8.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM OF REFUGEES FROM BOSNIA HERCEGOVINA, REGARDLESS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, NOW RESIDING IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 MEDLEY ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B11 2NE
- Phone:
- 01217723052
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window