THE WESTFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
pre-school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £81,984 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 December 1994: Standard registration
- 11 September 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1172178 SPACE
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1157199 BROXBOURNE FOODBANK
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1122670 WIPE AWAY THOSE TEARS
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 306107 SYDNEY A SMITH FUND
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1069535 CHIPS - Children's integrated playschemes
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1160558 BREAST CANCER NOW
- 11 September 2024: Funds transferred to 261017 MACMILLAN CANCER SUPPORT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.09k | £100.32k | £83.64k | £84.00k | £84.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.88k | £81.33k | £82.77k | £87.00k | £93.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £72.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £97.83k | N/A | £80.00k | £81.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
13 June 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1989 AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 1994 AND 9 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE ATTENDING WESTFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
Area of benefit
WESTFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window