FRIENDS OF BLACKMARSTON SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1042794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £8,846
Total expenditure: £2,091

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BLACKMARSTON SCHOOL PTFA (Previous name)
  • FRIENDS OF BLACKMARSTON SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Arron Fish Chair 19 October 2022
None on record
Jessica Mason Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Michelle Higgs Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Kelly Frances Leighton Trustee 29 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.66k £9.23k £1.83k £4.64k £8.85k
Total expenditure £36.64k £14.67k £1.54k £167 £2.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 March 2023 243 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 March 2023 608 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Blackmarston Day School
Honddu Close
Hereford
HR2 7NX
Phone:
01432272376
Website:

No information available