THE BURFORD CANNELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity recieves some income from investments, but has made no grants this year. Upon the demise of Mr Alexander Cannell and myself (Ian Burford), our estate will provide a large sum, the interest of which should be sufficient for at least two grants per year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 December 1994: Standard registration
- 14 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 January 2016: Funds transferred to 268876 THE YOUNG VIC COMPANY
- BURFORD CANNELL CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £451 | £0 | £0 | £500 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 07 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 06 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF TALENTED AND DESERVING EXPONENTS OF THE COMPONENT THEATRICAL ARTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ACTORS, SINGERS, DANCERS, PRODUCERS, CHOREOGRAPHERS AND DESIGNERS) BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES AND/OR OTHER AWARDS TO ASSIST THEM TO DEVELOP AND FURTHER THEIR SKILLS AND ABILITIES IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window