BURNLEY SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING PEOPLE WITH MOBILITY PROBLEMS OF ANY KIND THE MEANS OF VISITING BURNLEY. BUILDING SELF CONFIDENCE AND INDEPENDENCE. HELPING PEOPLE COPING WITH PHYSICAL HEALTH ISSUES AND DIFFICULTY GETTING ABOUT. WE PROVIDE SCOOTERS AND WHEELCHAIRS FOR PEOPLE TO ACCESS SHOPS AND SERVICES. WE ALSO HIRE WHEELCHAIRS, SCOOTER AND OTHER THINGS ON A WEEKLY BASIS. WE ARE STAFFED BY VOLUNTEERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 December 1994: Standard registration
- 27 March 2013: Funds received from 1026623 PENDLE SHOPMOBILITY
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Lionti | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Townsend | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.40k | £7.22k | £6.05k | £3.31k | £6.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.07k | £9.07k | £10.29k | £7.85k | £6.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1033 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1033 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 May 2020 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN PARTICULAR WHEELCHAIRS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BURNLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Casa Mia
Clough Springs
Barrowford
NELSON
BB9 6RN
- Phone:
- 07831809106
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window