NEXT STEP MINISTRIES TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Setting up and running of evangelistic events for all ages, alongside local churches Running short term mission trips in the summer, in partnership with other agencies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Romania
Governance
- 28:19 IN ACTION (Working name)
- N S M (Working name)
- OPERATION PETER SUMMER EXPEDITIONS (Working name)
- ZONE YOUTH TEAM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.20k | £377 | £180 | £2.15k | £3.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.92k | £645 | £149 | £2.12k | £3.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2021 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE AND IN PARTICULAR BY CONDUCTING ORGANISING OR UNDERTAKING EVANGELISTIC WORK IN VARIOUS WAYS TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window