THE GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH OF SAINT NECTARIOS

Charity number: 1042830
Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To preserve the Christian orthodox faith as interpreted and taught by the Greek Church of Christ the Ecumenical Patriarchate of Constantinople and the Greek Archdiocese of Thyateira and Great Britain. To relieve poverty and sickness.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £149,676
Total expenditure: £122,463

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARCHBISHOP NIKITAS LIOULIAS Chair 04 May 2022
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST. ATHANASIOS, CAMBRIDGE
Received: 48 days late
ST ELEFTHERIOS
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST ANDREW
Recently registered
Savvas Kyriakou Savva Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Ioannis Tsoukkas Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Martin Miller Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Leonidas Christophilopoulos Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Father Christodoulos Christodoulou Trustee 04 May 2022
CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX THYATEIRA YOUTH
Received: 42 days late
ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
OLIVE BRANCH AID
Received: On time
Sotiroulla Helen Antoniou-Pamment Trustee 04 May 2022
OLIVE BRANCH AID
Received: On time
Mary Mavrogheni Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
KOULLA KATSIKIDES Trustee 15 October 1974
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £25.67k £29.52k £102.09k £191.33k £149.68k
Total expenditure £59.26k £52.19k £44.79k £90.39k £122.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.04k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 February 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 February 2024 104 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 March 2022 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 March 2022 136 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Nectarios Church
19 Wycliffe Road
LONDON
SW11 5QR
Phone:
020 7228 4278