THE RICHARD JEFFERIES SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was founded in 1950 to promote appreciation and study of the writings of Richard Jefferies (1848-1887). Members receive spring and autumn newsletters, an annual report and a Journal and can take advantage of the Society's extensive library. Activities include winter meetings, a study day, special outings, events, a Birthday Lecture and an Annual General Meeting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN DAVID CORKERTON | Chair | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Dillon | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Dawes | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair J Watts | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Blake Lee Harwood | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Welshman | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR MIKE PRINGLE | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Barry Sloan | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILLIAM ROSSABI | Trustee | 06 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JAMES ROGER EBBATSON | Trustee | 06 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
Jean Ann Dolores Saunders | Trustee | 14 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THOMAS PRICE | Trustee | 21 October 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £5.56k | £11.13k | £6.89k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.99k | £5.15k | £9.41k | £10.32k | £4.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED ON 9 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 8 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 2016 as amended on 27 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE LIFE AND WORKS OF RICHARD JEFFERIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Mill
Mill Drive
Foulsham
Dereham
NR20 5RB
- Phone:
- 01362683210
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window