Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S BURNHAM WESTGATE CHURCH

Charity number: 1042871
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 December 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2021 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required