SUTTON ON THE HILL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sutton On The Hill Pre-School is a sessional run pre-school . We provide a safe caring environment in which children can learn through play. All of our staff are NVQ Qualified or have many years experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 December 1994: Standard registration
- SUTTON PLAYGROUP (SUTTON) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margot Colgrave | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Ellen Latham | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Bridge | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.42k | £32.40k | £49.15k | £65.07k | £75.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.67k | £32.27k | £42.88k | £76.18k | £81.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
School Lane
Sutton on the Hill
Ashbourne
Derbyshire
DE6 5JA
- Phone:
- 07969 368599
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window