RELIEF AID LOGISTICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of logistics for relief work, including but not exclusively transport and storage of relief supplies and any other charitable goods or materials owned by charities or used for charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Mary Norman | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|||
JONATHAN COOK | Trustee | 02 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £210 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.12k | £0 | £245 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 28 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NO SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITIES OF THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE SUITABLE BUILDINGS PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PROVISION OF STANDBY WAREHOUSE AND TRANSHIPMENT FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION STORAGE AND ONWARD DELIVERY OF RELIEF SUPPLIES BY RELIEF CHARITIES AND SUBJECT TO SUCH CHANGES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND, IN PARTICULAR BUT NO SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITIES OF THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE SUITABLE BUILDINGS PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PROVISION OF STANDBY PREMISES FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO PROTECT THE PUBLIC IN THE EVENT OF A DISASTER OR EMERGENCY SUBJECT TO SUCH CHARGES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Bower Street
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME16 8SD
- Phone:
- 01622807683
- Email:
- info@reliefaidlogistics.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window