EAST MARKHAM CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up specifically to help people of limited means who live in East Markham, by making grants to individuals and by providing accommodation. This consists of three one-bedroomed bungalows suitable for older people, and a two bedroomed house, suitable as a starter home for a young family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 20 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Mackenzie Carlin | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ian Ogle | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Usher | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRIS LILLIAN CODDINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT WILLIAM BENNETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHERYL DAVIDSON-LYTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.26k | £22.77k | £24.74k | £25.00k | £23.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.38k | £22.41k | £23.76k | £24.63k | £22.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY NOT MORE THAN TWO THIRDS OF THE INCOME IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.THE RESIDUE IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FURTHER ALMSHOUSES TO BE APPROPRIATED AND USED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THIS SCHEME.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF EAST MARKHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Church Lane
West Drayton
Retford
DN22 8EB
- Phone:
- 07711822510
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window