Financial history EVENLODE VALE MINISTRY TRUST

Charity Number: 1042961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.54k £64.77k £13.81k £4.65k £3.21k
Total expenditure £33.41k £46.51k £24.66k £1.31k £382
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A