Financial history FAIRHAM COMMUNITY COLLEGE FUND

Charity number: 1042980
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £10.74k £8.27k £3.63k £8.88k £5.86k
Total expenditure £9.52k £8.80k £3.26k £938 £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A