Financial history THE MFANTSIPIM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1042983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £420 £475 £5.38k £7.75k £19.22k
Total expenditure £958 £150 £3.35k £6.02k £12.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A