THE MFANTSIPIM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Sustain the interest of Mfantsipim Past Students in the diaspora by organising meetings and functions. 2. Coordinate fundraising activities for Mfantsipim School in particular and the Cape Coast Metropolitan area in general. 3. Acquire and donate scientific equipment, information and communications technology tools, fund scholarships, awards, prizes, teaching aids and mentoring projects etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- Ireland
Governance
- 22 December 1994: Standard registration
- MOBA (UK&I) (Working name)
- MFANTSIPIM OLD BOYS' ASSOCIATION (UK AND IRELAND) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ATO SIAW | Chair | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KODWO FYNN | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES H BEDU-ADDO | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEORGE BRAY | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
DONALD DUODU | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £420 | £475 | £5.38k | £7.75k | £19.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £958 | £150 | £3.35k | £6.02k | £12.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 AUGUST 1993 AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1994 AND 14 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING MFANTSIPIM SECONDARY SCHOOL, CAPE COAST, GHANA, BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND OTHER AMENITIES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG FORMER PUPILS AND TUTORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY MEANS OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT, MUTUAL ASSISTANCE AND SELF-HELP TO FORMER PUPILS WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 3) TO ADVANCE RELIGION AND EDUCATION BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING A CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SAID ASSOCIATION WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IRELAND.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, GHANA AND EIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 KINGSMERE CLOSE
LONDON
SW15 1AT
- Phone:
- +447539180207
- Website:
-
mfantsipimfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window