WELLSPRING COUNSELLING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of community based counselling to those in need within the local area of North Somerset
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,906 from 2 government contract(s) and £7,088 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mary Chisnall | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Morey Alisdair Christopher Andrews | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachel Dunn | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Emma Dugdale | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Jenner | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isla Hobbs | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Astrid Tiesema-Samsom | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|||||
ROB SWIFT | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR MARY FRANCES BACKHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.72k | £347.55k | £180.21k | £198.42k | £300.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £273.56k | £255.64k | £164.01k | £157.10k | £210.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £330 | £18.91k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £17.27k | £9.45k | £10.50k | £7.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED COUNSELLING TO THOSE IN NEED THEREOF AND BY TRAINING AND EDUCATING MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY IN COUNSELLING AND ALLIED SKILLS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-NAILSEA, BACKWELL, WOODSPRING DISTRICT, BRISTOL, WANSDYKE DISTRICT, BATH,KINGSWOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellspring Counselling Ltd
74 Silver Street
Nailsea
BRISTOL
BS48 2DS
- Phone:
- 01275810879
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window