STAMFORD PARK INFANT SCHOOL PARENT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1042997
Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity exists to raise money to support Stamford Park Infants School and to create social links between parents and between parents and the school. This is done mainly by organising events such as an annual Auction of pledges and a Summer Fun Day.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020

Total income: £8,548
Total expenditure: £3,431

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STAMFORD PARK INFANT SCHOOL SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Fisher Chair 30 October 2017
None on record
Michelle Thackray Trustee 02 October 2018
None on record
Rebecca Faulkner Trustee 30 October 2017
None on record
Reena King Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.57k £13.89k £14.99k £10.88k £8.55k
Total expenditure £11.40k £10.56k £15.42k £11.31k £3.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Welman Way
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 8WE
Phone:
07824999749
Website:

No information available