LOWESTOFT COMMUNITY CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lowestoft Community Church is a Christian church made up of people from a wide range of ages and backgrounds from in and around the Lowestoft area. As a local church it is our goal to reach out to the local community, and to the Nations, with the good news of Jesus Christ and to worship him in every aspect of our lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 December 1994: Standard registration
- 08 February 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 08 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1181951 LOWESTOFT COMMUNITY CHURCH
- LCC (Working name)
- LOWESTOFT COVENANT CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 20/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.34k | £224.00k | £232.07k | £261.73k | £123.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.28k | £217.78k | £227.79k | £275.46k | £894.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.80k | £1.44k | £3.25k | £910 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 January 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 January 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 21 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 21 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 AUGUST 1994
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO PROCLAIM AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD AND HIS SON THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (2) TO RELIEVE THE ELDERLY SICK NEEDY AND DISTRESSED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE LOWESTOFT COVENANT CHURCH BY WHATEVER MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LOWESTOFT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window