FRIENDS OF SYCAMORE COURT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for people with learning disabilities. To advance the personal development of residents residing at Sycamore Court Residential Care home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 December 1994: Standard registration
- 24 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- FRIENDS OF SYCAMORE COURT (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF SKELTON COURT (Previous name)
- GEORGE RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITIES (Previous name)
- GEORGE RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITIES - FRIENDS OF SYCAMORE COURT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.27k | £1.35k | £1.75k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | £3.24k | £2.92k | £20 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APR 1994 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2016 as amended on 02 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLEMENT NEED,HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS BY: A.PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF THE ACCOMMODATION. B.ANY OTHER SUCH MEANS AS ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OF SUCH PERSONS. C.FURTHERING ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE PURSUED IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE PURSUIT OF THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECT AND HAVE THE EFFECT OF PROMOTING THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window