TIDESWELL AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The previous premises managed by the Club burnt down in 2015. A new Hall has been rebuilt and opened in 2022. The Charity manages the Hall as a Community space for hire. The aim is to support a range of community groups and classes for the benefit of the community and to provide opportunities for the youth of the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 22 December 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Jane Longden | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Murphy | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wright | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH BROMLEY WILLOUGHBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARY WILLIAM HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35k | £57.32k | £173.03k | £19.25k | £38.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.27k | £140.66k | £221.91k | £61.81k | £18.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
1.TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES. 2.TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A YOUTH CLUB.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TIDESWELL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tideswell Community Hall
Church Lane
Tideswell
BUXTON
Derbyshire
SK17 8PD
- Phone:
- 07970708899
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window