Accounts and annual returns KIRKLEES YOUTH TRAINING

Charity Number: 1043071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 24 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 01 May 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 21 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 03 May 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2010 10 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 03 February 2011 On Time