Financial history KIRKLEES YOUTH TRAINING

Charity Number: 1043071
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012
Total gross income £962.76k £952.49k £782.93k £883.43k £642.99k
Total expenditure £953.97k £950.60k £890.85k £818.00k £721.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £947.85k £945.72k £779.78k £880.67k £637.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.81k £4.59k £3.08k £2.73k £5.22k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.10k £2.18k £66 £20 £12
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £942.36k £938.53k £878.59k £808.33k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.60k £12.07k £12.26k £9.67k £25.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0