ELM PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
school year disco, cakes sales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 05 January 1995: Standard registration
- AYLOFF PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashlea Stevenson | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Helen Walker | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Hewish | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.04k | £4.40k | £2.17k | £14.52k | £21.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.67k | £4.14k | £3.47k | £6.51k | £23.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 April 2021 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1983 AMENDED 1985 AND SEPTEMBER 21 1994 AS AMENDED 2 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE ELM PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Emma Hewish
Elm Park Primary School
Elm Park
Hornchurch
Hornchurch
Essex
- Phone:
- 01708541463
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window