PETER B LEEMING MEMORIAL TRUST FOR ANIMAL WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist with the payment of veterinary costs to persons on low incomes and/or benefits. To make contributions to other animal care charities at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 04 January 1995: Standard registration
- SAVE A PET (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debby Rawsthorn | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BONNICK | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KAREN LOUISE HAYES | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LAURA NORMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.90k | £237.68k | £177.51k | £2.92k | £4.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.77k | £21.69k | £19.72k | £22.08k | £25.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF: 1.ANIMAL SHELTERS FOR THE PROTECTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED ANIMALS AND FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS WHO ARE SICK AND INJURED.2.FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GRANTS TO SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES HAVING SIMILAR OBKECTS TO THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 St. Michaels Grove
Bolton Le Sands
CARNFORTH
Lancashire
LA5 8JB
- Phone:
- 07946624884
- Email:
- SAVEAPET2023.ORG@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window