SCUNTHORPE MUSICAL FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of competitive festivals for dance, drama/speech & music. At these bursaries may be awarded or fees paid for the further development of competitors. We also hold an annual drama summer school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 January 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr clare rebecca mary gooing | Chair | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RODNEY WHEAT FCCA | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JANE HOLMES | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.49k | £6.07k | £368 | £23.16k | £21.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.09k | £10.05k | £738 | £17.90k | £20.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES
Area of benefit
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crosby Primary School
Normanby Road
Scunthorpe
North Lincolnshire
DN15 6AS
- Phone:
- 01724 734543
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window