THE DAVID CLOVER FESTIVAL OF SINGING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Singing Festival in the memory of David Clover . Held annually in Sheffield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Lancashire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 January 1995: Standard registration
- 16 January 2024: Funds received from 1063734 MOZART INTERNATIONAL SINGING COMPETITION
- DAVID CLOVER COMPETITION (Working name)
- THE DAVID CLOVER COMPETITION FOR SINGERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ian Heslop OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Geoffrey Littledyke | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Valerie Littledyke | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Eric Barraclough | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Louise Hall | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Sarah Hulse | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Vivien Pike | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anthony Trippett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.80k | £1.64k | £13.73k | £11.63k | £17.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.92k | £1.80k | £13.05k | £11.92k | £19.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 2009 as amended on 22 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ART OF SINGING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
151 Albert Road
SHEFFIELD
Sheffield
South Yorkshire
S8 9QX
- Phone:
- 07510699821
- Email:
- kathryn_wells_uk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window