THE SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE WATER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Trust is to apply its income towards relieving those customers who are in conditions of need, poverty, hardship or other distress and are having difficulty making payment for the supply of water to their home but make regular payments for an amount they can afford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Birmingham City
- Cambridgeshire
- Derbyshire
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 09 January 1995: Standard registration
- SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE WATER CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- THE SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE WATER DISCONNECTIONS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN TERRY THOMPSON | Chair | 15 October 1993 |
|
|||||
Adrian Eggington | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Hyde | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN STEPHEN JONES | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Richard Curtis | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD CYSEWSKI | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|||||
TOM MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.13k | £170.53k | £195.86k | £298.03k | £239.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.13k | £170.53k | £195.86k | £298.03k | £239.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 OCTOBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS RELIEVING THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED POVERTY HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISTRESS AND ARE UNABLE TO MEET OR PAY FOR CHARGES FOR THE SUPPLY OF WATER TO THE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION OCCUPIED BY SUCH PERSONS AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH STAFFORDSHIRE WATER PLC
GREEN LANE
WALSALL
WS2 7PD
- Phone:
- 01922638282
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window