Financial history ABERHAFESP COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1043185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.98k £12.58k £6.93k £13.96k £12.41k
Total expenditure £13.89k £7.42k £19.99k £10.12k £15.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.41k £11.84k N/A £3.94k £450