Trustees ADEC (ARTS DEVELOPMENT IN EAST CAMBRIDGESHIRE)
Charity number: 1043197
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Marie Bainbridge | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Harvey | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Anne Veith | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda McCord | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Downey | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Green | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Holland | Trustee | 12 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR TED CONEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.