Accounts and annual returns RIVERSIDE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1043209
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 18 May 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 08 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 February 2018 On Time