RWANDA DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports organisations working within Rwanda in order directly to assist Rwandese in generating income, or to improve the capacity of these organisations in their attempts to do the same.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rwanda
Governance
- 10 January 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KARIN TEARLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATI WHITAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63k | £1.18k | £1.17k | £859 | £1.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66k | £1.91k | £2.44k | £1.06k | £1.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF THE INHABITANTS OF RWANDA, WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD, WAR OR ANY OTHER DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS, ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE. 2) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY BY THE DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATION, HEALTH AND OTHER SOCIAL SERVICES, THE IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURAL METHODS, WATER SUPPLIES AND OTHER COMMUNAL FACILITIES, AND THE PROMOTION OF SELF-HELP ACTIVITIES IN RWANDA.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE - RWANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 ROCHESTER AVENUE
BROMLEY
BR1 3DN
- Phone:
- 07956813605
- Email:
- rwandadt@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window